NH SB46 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2015; Chapter 0176; Effective 06/26/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to public safety radio interoperability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to public safety radio interoperability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-30SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/26/2015; Chapter 0176; Effective 06/26/2015
2015-06-11HouseEnrolled; House Journal 46, PG. 1989
2015-06-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 6/4/2015); Senate Journal 18
2015-06-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1998e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17
2015-06-01HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1998EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1783
2015-05-21SenateSen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1489h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15
2015-05-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1489h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1750
2015-05-06HouseAmendment #1489h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1750
2015-04-30HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1489h for May 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1508
2015-04-29HouseExecutive Session: 4/29/2015 immediately after session Legislative Office Building 306
2015-04-16HousePublic Hearing: 4/28/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2015-04-15HouseReferred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 34, PG. 1560
2015-04-15HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 214-124; House Journal 34, PG. 1559-1560
2015-04-09HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-04-09HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1310
2015-04-01HouseExecutive Session: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2015-03-18HousePublic Hearing: 3/24/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 22, PG. 629
2015-02-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0321s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6
2015-02-19SenateSen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment #2015-0321s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6
2015-02-19SenateSen. D’Allesandro Moved to Remove SB 46 from the Consent Calendar
2015-02-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2015-02-12SenateSpecial Order SB 46 to 2/19/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted
2015-01-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2015-01-14SenateHearing: 1/21/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback