NH SB459 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1889
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1889
Summary
Relative to medical payments coverage.
Title
Relative to medical payments coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1889 | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 5 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34, PG.1623 | |
2010-04-20 | House Executive Session: 4/22/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-04-20 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2010 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-04-07 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/15/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2010-04-07 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 4/7/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 30, PG.1521 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.256 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.191 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Hearing: March 8, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2910&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |