NH SB458 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to municipal regulation of vacation or short-term rentals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to municipal regulation of vacation or short-term rentals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateVacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
2020-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 5
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback