NH SB452 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2016; Chapter 0195; Effective 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2016; Chapter 0195; Effective 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain state agencies to conduct an audit of laws governing coastal regions to enable authorities to take appropriate actions.
Title
Requiring certain state agencies to conduct an audit of laws governing coastal regions to enable authorities to take appropriate actions.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. David Borden [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2016; Chapter 0195; Effective 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 206-115 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 69 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 20 |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/03/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/26/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2016; Senate Calendar 10 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0624s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0624s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0624s, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing: 02/17/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |