NH SB450 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0244; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0244; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the prescription drug affordability board.
Title
Relative to the prescription drug affordability board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 173 N: 161 NV: 11 Abs: 44) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0244; Effective 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Reconsider SB450 (Rep. Goley): Motion Failed DV 157-175 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 173-161 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Failed DV 164-168 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1202s and 2022-1254s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2022-1254s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1202s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1202s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/20/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |