NH SB45 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - II. Remainder Effective 07/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - II. Remainder Effective 07/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Title
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0167s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0167s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0167s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0167s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/23/2021 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | I. Sections 1-10 Effective as provided in Section 11 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2021; Chapter 0148 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1253h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1253h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1253h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 8 |
2021-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/13/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94103091494 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0167s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0167s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0167s, 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/20/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |