NH SB45 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB45
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2723h (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2723h (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electioneering at polling places.
Title
Relative to electioneering at polling places.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2723h (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-08-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-25 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB45 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2723h (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar)