NH SB444 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amending the alimony statute due to changes in federal tax law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the alimony statute due to changes in federal tax law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseVacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 59
2020-01-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0166s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-0166s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0166s, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4
2020-01-08SenateHearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 2
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback