NH SB443 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - II. Remainder shall take effect 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - II. Remainder shall take effect 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the jurisdiction of counties concerning retail electric supply, and allowing the Carroll county convention to employ a delegation coordinator.
Title
Relative to the jurisdiction of counties concerning retail electric supply, and allowing the Carroll county convention to employ a delegation coordinator.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | II. Remainder shall take effect 08/07/2018 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 06/08/2018 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0225 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-11 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 25 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Science, Technology and Energy 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 6 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1124h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 6 |
2018-04-05 | House | Amendment # 2018-1124h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 6 |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1124h (NT) for 04/05/2018 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5 |
2018-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-1124h: 03/27/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/20/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |