NH SB441 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0293; Effective 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0293; Effective 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing an advisory group to examine potential funding sources for career and technical education (CTE) construction and renovation.
Title
Relative to establishing an advisory group to examine potential funding sources for career and technical education (CTE) construction and renovation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0293; Effective 07/26/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Ward Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1447h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 9 |
2024-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2024-1447h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 9 |
2024-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1447h 04/09/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 7 |
2024-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/09/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/26/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 6 P. 139 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 3A |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |