NH SB440 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the New Hampshire collaborative law act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the New Hampshire collaborative law act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 59
2020-01-30SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4
2020-01-08SenateHearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 2
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback