NH SB44 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB44

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the New Hampshire workforce pathway program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the New Hampshire workforce pathway program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0783s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-05-25HouseRetained in Committee
2021-04-28HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/13/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94308033489
2021-04-28HouseExecutive Session: 05/20/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92551660487
2021-04-14HousePublic Hearing: 04/21/2021 09:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97777026171 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-17HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 50
2021-03-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0783s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2021-0783s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2021; Senate Calendar 14
2021-02-11SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
2021-02-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-13SenateRemote Hearing: 01/19/2021, 10:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 7
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3

Same As/Similar To

SB44 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=990&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB44
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=981&txtFormat=html
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=981
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=38&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0044&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB44&ddlsponsors=&lsr=990
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=120&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0044&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB44&ddlsponsors=&lsr=990
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=121&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0044&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB44&ddlsponsors=&lsr=990

Bill Comments

feedback