NH SB44 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0019; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0019; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nonpublic sessions of public bodies under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to nonpublic sessions of public bodies under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0019; Effective 01/01/2016 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1546 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1305 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/29/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |