NH SB436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - No Pending Motion; 02/03/2022 Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - No Pending Motion; 02/03/2022 Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to abortion care.
Title
Relative to access to abortion care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 02/03/2022 Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |