NH SB434 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the reduction in the calculation of state retirement annuities at age 65.
Title
Relative to the reduction in the calculation of state retirement annuities at age 65.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Rep. James Allard [R] |
Rep. Kevin Pratt [R] | Rep. Troy Merner [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |