NH SB426 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an end-of-life choices study commission.
Title
Establishing an end-of-life choices study commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 123 N: 174 NV: 69 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 107 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1257h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 123-174 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 105 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1257h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 104 |
2016-05-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 29 P. 25 |
2016-05-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1257h for 05/11/2016 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 25 |
2016-04-20 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-03-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/30/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 17 P. 51 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |