NH SB423 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0099; Effective 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0099; Effective 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a closed loop referral system in the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to a closed loop referral system in the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Salloway [D] |
Rep. James Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0099; Effective 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8A |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0465s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0465s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0465s, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/27/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:25 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |