NH SB422 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to advance notice of work schedules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to advance notice of work schedules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Sen. French Floor Amendment 1002s (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. French Floor Amendment # 2018-1002s, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Woodburn Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. French Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1002s; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. French Moved Ought to Pass; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-24Senate===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 5
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2946&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB422
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1962&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=74&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0422&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB422&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2946
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=75&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0422&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB422&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2946
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=76&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0422&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB422&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2946
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=77&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0422&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB422&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2946

Bill Comments

feedback