NH SB42 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB42
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring Old Hampshire Applejack the state spirit of New Hampshire.
Title
Declaring Old Hampshire Applejack the state spirit of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1082s, Regular Calendar 10Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1082s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 15Y-7N, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 8Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB 42 from the Consent Calendar; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB42 (Carry Over) 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar