NH SB42 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declaring Old Hampshire Applejack the state spirit of New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring Old Hampshire Applejack the state spirit of New Hampshire.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 8 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1082s, Regular Calendar 10Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1082s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Watters Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 15Y-7N, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Watters Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 8Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB 42 from the Consent Calendar; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback