NH SB42 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0171; Effective 08/27/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0171; Effective 08/27/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the hearing requirement for late reinstatement of corporations.
Title
Eliminating the hearing requirement for late reinstatement of corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2017; Chapter 0171; Effective 08/27/2017 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-13 | House | Enrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 5 |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/01/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 6 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-05-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/16/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-04-18 | House | Public Hearing: 05/11/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0256s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0256s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0256s, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |