NH SB416 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0238; Effective 01/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0238; Effective 01/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to behavioral health assessment and treatment for children in out-of-home placements.
Title
Relative to behavioral health assessment and treatment for children in out-of-home placements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0238; Effective 01/01/2024 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1786h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1786h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1786h (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/26/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/25/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1668h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | FLAM # 2022-1668h (Rep. Weber): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-19 | House | Withdrawn from Committee Without Recommendation House Calendar 15 P. 18 |
2022-04-14 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1120s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1120s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1120s, 03/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |