NH SB412 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0237; Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0237; Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for nursing home reimbursement rates.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for nursing home reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0237; Effective 06/17/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1582h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1582h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1582h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-14 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-04-06 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/13/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/13/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Finance |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |