NH SB412 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor on 05/16/2018; Chapter 0056; Effective 07/15/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to agritourism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to agritourism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/16/2018; Chapter 0056; Effective 07/15/2018
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-11SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-08SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1822e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-05-08HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1822e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8
2018-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301
2018-03-28HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 8 P. 70
2018-03-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1011s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1011s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1011s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12
2017-12-21Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 01/10/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 49
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback