NH SB412 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a minimum wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a minimum wage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-04 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-04SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4
2016-02-04SenateSpecial Order SB 412 to the beginning of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted
2016-01-27SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/04/2016; Senate Calendar 4
2016-01-21SenateHearing: 01/26/2016, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 3
2015-12-29SenateTo Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback