NH SB406 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0052; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0052; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring background checks for access to Internal Revenue Service federal tax information.
Title
Requiring background checks for access to Internal Revenue Service federal tax information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0052; Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 16 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5 |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 4 |
2018-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |