NH SB401 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 18-286 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 18-286 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to repair of roads not maintained by a municipality.
Title
Relative to repair of roads not maintained by a municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Shall House Consider: Motion Failed DV 18-286 lacking necessary two-thirds vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0810s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0810s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0810s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |