NH SB400 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Lay SB400 on Table (Rep. Wuelper): Motion Adopted DV 170-159 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to training and procedures for zoning and planning boards and relative to financial investments and incentives for affordable housing development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to training and procedures for zoning and planning boards and relative to financial investments and incentives for affordable housing development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05HouseLay SB400 on Table (Rep. Wuelper): Motion Adopted DV 170-159 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
2022-04-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2022-04-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1848h (NT) (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar)
2022-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/27/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2022-04-06HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2022-03-29HousePublic Hearing: 04/07/2022 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2022-03-23HouseIntroduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government
2022-03-17SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-0999s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-17SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-17SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2022-0999s; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-17SenateSen. Avard Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-17SenateCommittee Amendment # 2022-0999s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0999s, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11
2022-01-05SenateHearing: 01/20/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2
2021-12-23SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2888&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=SB400
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2022&id=1981&txtFormat=html
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2022&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1981
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2022&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=1981
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=58&sy=2022&lb=S&eb=SB0400&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=SB400&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2888
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=59&sy=2022&lb=S&eb=SB0400&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=SB400&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2888

Bill Comments

feedback