NH SB4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 220; Effective 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 220; Effective 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.
Title
Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - OTP (Y: 213 N: 137 NV: 20 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 220; Effective 09/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2379e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2379e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-137 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 64 |
2019-04-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-04-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 13 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/25/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1176s, Regular Calendar 22Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1176s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1176s, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |