NH SB4 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Conference Committee Report 2030c; Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Failed; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Conference Committee Report 2030c; Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Failed; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eligibility to vote and relative to availability of voter information.
Title
Relative to eligibility to vote and relative to availability of voter information.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2030c (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 192 N: 141 NV: 36 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Non-Concur Request Committee of Conference (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Concur (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 144 NV: 19 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment 2015-3086s (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 192 N: 141 NV: 36 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Non-Concur Request Committee of Conference (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Concur (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 144 NV: 19 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment 2015-3086s (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2030c; Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Failed; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2030c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 192-141 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 3 |
2016-05-25 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-2030c Filed 05/25/2016; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Carson Replaces Senator Lasky |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/24/2016, 9:00 a.m., Room 103, State House |
2016-05-20 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hoelzel, Schroadter, Gray, Gannon 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17 |
2016-05-20 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Hoelzel): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Bradley, Lasky; 05/19/2016; |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1349h; Requests C of C, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1349h, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1349h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-144 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 62 |
2016-05-11 | House | FLAM #2016-1876h (Rep. Gannon): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 58 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1349h: Amendment Adopted DV 202-140 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 57 |
2016-04-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 29 P. 19 |
2016-04-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1349h for 05/11/2016 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 19 |
2016-03-30 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 10:35 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 01/28/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 10 P. 10 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 3086s, New Title, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/21/2016; Senate Journal 3 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 3086s, New Title, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 01/21/2016 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-3086s, New Title, 01/21/2016; Senate Calendar 2 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/11/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |