NH SB397 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/24/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/24/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the mental health counseling compact and the interstate compact on the placement of children.
Title
Relative to the mental health counseling compact and the interstate compact on the placement of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 202 N: 132 NV: 11 Abs: 44) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/24/2022 |
2022-06-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2100e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2100-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1759h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-132 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1759h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1759h (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-27 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-04-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-04-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/22/2022 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 Mental Health Compact Only |
2022-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-0343s and 2022-0449s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0343s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2022-0449s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0343s, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am, on proposed amendment # 2022-0172s; Senate Calendar 4 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |