NH SB391 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - II. Remainder Effective 06/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - II. Remainder Effective 06/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annulment of certain misdemeanor offenses.
Title
Relative to annulment of certain misdemeanor offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] | Rep. Brian Gallagher [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. Herb Vadney [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 333 N: 11 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/24/2016 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | I. Sections 1 and 2 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 3 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2016; Chapter 0325 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/16/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-16 | House | Enrolled 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2162e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2162e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2037c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2037c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 333-11 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 18 |
2016-05-27 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-2037c Filed 05/26/2016; As Amended by the Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Hirsch Replaces Rep. DiSesa 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 30 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/24/2016, 11:00 a.m., Room 100, State House |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Tholl, Martin, DiSesa, Parker 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 16 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 16 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Forrester, Lasky; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1300h, New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; 05/19/2016 Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1300h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 13 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1300h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 13 |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1300h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 8 |
2016-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Hearing: 03/08/2016, Room 100, State House, 10:40 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |