NH SB389 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0114; Effective 07/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0114; Effective 07/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administrative fees on restitution.
Title
Relative to administrative fees on restitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. Joseph Hagan [R] | Rep. Janet Wall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0114; Effective 07/24/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 6 |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 14-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 6 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |