NH SB386 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0175; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0175; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the determination of state adequate education grants and chartered public school tuition amounts.
Title
Relative to the determination of state adequate education grants and chartered public school tuition amounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Rep. Karen Umberger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0175; Effective 07/01/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |