NH SB383 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2010; Effective 07/13/2010; Chapter 0311
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2010; Effective 07/13/2010; Chapter 0311
Summary
Relative to economic revitalization zone tax credits.
Title
Relative to economic revitalization zone tax credits.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Rep. Jane Clemons [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] |
Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. William Hatch [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-13 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2010; Effective 07/13/2010; Chapter 0311 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2416 Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2416 Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2221; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-06-02 | House Conference Committee Report #2221 Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-27 | House Conference Committee Report #2221, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 43, PG.2158 | |
2010-05-24 | Senate C of C Meeting: == RECONVENE === May 25, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-05-24 | Senate C of C Meeting: == RECESSED === May 24, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/24/2010 1:30 p.m., Room 101, Legislative Office Building | |
2010-05-19 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hatch, Vachon, Walsh & Lockwood; House Journal 46, PG.2240-2241 | |
2010-05-19 | House House Accedes to Request for Comm of Conf (Rep Hess): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2240-2241 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Lasky, Reynolds and Odell; Senate Journal 20, Pg.645 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. Odell Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1491h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.645 | |
2010-05-05 | House Reconsideration (Rep Vaillancourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 133-200; House Journal 38, PG.1912 | |
2010-05-05 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1491h (NT): Motion Adopted Division Vote 245-101; House Journal 38, PG.1901-1904 | |
2010-05-05 | House Amendment #1491h (New Title) Adopted, Regular Calendar 174-167; House Journal 38, PG.1901-1904 | |
2010-04-27 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 34, PG.1629 | |
2010-04-27 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #1491h (New Title); House Calendar 34, PG.1643-1644 | |
2010-04-27 | House Majority Com Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1491h (NT) for May 5 (Vote 11-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 34, PG.1629 | |
2010-04-14 | House Executive Session: 4/22/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-04-14 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:15 Amendment)== | |
2010-04-07 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2010 Legislative Office Building 202 1:30 PM or Immediately Following House Session | |
2010-03-31 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/7/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 3/30/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 26, PG.1391 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.150 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0891s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.147 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment 0891s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.147 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0891s, New Title, 3/10/10; Senate Calendar 10, Pg.10 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Hearing; January 26, 2010, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.8 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2711&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |