NH SB382 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0174; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0174; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure requirements for telehealth services and relative to licensure of physicians and physicians assistants through reciprocity agreements.
Title
Relative to licensure requirements for telehealth services and relative to licensure of physicians and physicians assistants through reciprocity agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - Table (Y: 144 N: 187 NV: 14 Abs: 44) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1290s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1290s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0174; Effective 08/06/2022 |
2022-06-01 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Lay SB382 on Table (Rep. Post): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-187 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1290s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2022-1290s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove SB 382 from the Consent Calendar; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |