NH SB381 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a municipality from designating a road as a private road under certain conditions.
Title
Prohibiting a municipality from designating a road as a private road under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] |
Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/08/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |