NH SB381 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting immunization/vaccination requirements for Hepatitis B.
Title
Deleting immunization/vaccination requirements for Hepatitis B.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Mary Freitas [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Special Order to the Call of the Chair, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |