NH SB38 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0054; Effective 07/31/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0054; Effective 07/31/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending the procedure for issuing a summons instead of an arrest.
Title
Amending the procedure for issuing a summons instead of an arrest.
Sponsors
Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0054; Effective 07/31/2023 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/18/2023); Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 3 |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/30/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-03-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/30/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0580s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0580s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0580s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |