NH SB38 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - II. Remainder Effective 07/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - II. Remainder Effective 07/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of transportation for local highway aid and aid for municipal bridges, relative to distribution of highway aid, and relative to red list bridges.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of transportation for local highway aid and aid for municipal bridges, relative to distribution of highway aid, and relative to red list bridges.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/11/2017 |
2017-07-12 | Senate | I. Section 3-6 Effective 07/01/2017 |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2017; Chapter 0227 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1998h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 120 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1998h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 120 |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1998h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 14 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-05-16 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/23/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-05-10 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/16/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-05-04 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/11/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Finance 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 37 |
2017-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1437h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 35 |
2017-05-04 | House | Amendment #2017-1437h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 35 |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1437h (NT) for 05/04/2017 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 9 |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2017-1311h: 04/11/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 26 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0897s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0897s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0897s, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |