NH SB38 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - II. Remainder Effective 06/26/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - II. Remainder Effective 06/26/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to develop a land conservation plan.
Title
Establishing a commission to develop a land conservation plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/26/15 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 12/31/16 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2015; Chapter 0174 |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG. 1989 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/4/2015); Senate Journal 18 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1940e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1940EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1783 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Concurs with House Amendment #1239h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1239h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1548 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1239h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1548 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1239h for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1306 |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/7/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/31/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-19 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 3/24/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/24/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing: 3/18/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 22, PG. 628 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0050s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0050s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0050s, 1/29/15; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |