NH SB379 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0317; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0317; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to retroactive denials of previously paid claims.
Title
Relative to retroactive denials of previously paid claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0317; Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1975c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1975c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1975c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the Senate |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/14/2018, 11:00 am, Room 103, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Butler, Plumer, Schwaegler 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Carson, Hennessey; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | FLAM # 2018-1863h (NT) (Rep. Bouldin): Amendment Adopted DV 294-35 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1863h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Butler) 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 4 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/04/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0416s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0416s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0416s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |