NH SB377 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of dentists and dental hygienists by the board of dental examiners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of dentists and dental hygienists by the board of dental examiners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 274 N: 49 NV: 43 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateII. Remainder Effective 08/24/2018
2018-06-29SenateI. Sections 5 and 16 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 17
2018-06-29SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0316
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2096e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2096e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-10SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-02HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1402h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 274-49 05/02/2018
2018-05-02HouseAmendment # 2018-1402h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1402h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 17
2018-04-25HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/29/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 51
2018-01-18SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3
2018-01-03SenateHearing: 01/11/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 2
2017-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback