NH SB373 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring rulemaking by the department of corrections.
Title
Requiring rulemaking by the department of corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 17 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0995s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0995s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0995s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |