NH SB369 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organic farming.
Title
Relative to organic farming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |