NH SB366 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0248; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring an audit of ballots cast in the 2022 primary and general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring an audit of ballots cast in the 2022 primary and general election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 177 N: 139 NV: 28 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-07SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0248; Effective 07/01/2022
2022-06-22SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13
2022-06-22HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
2022-05-26SenateConference Committee Report # 2022-2020c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13
2022-05-26HouseConference Committee Report 2022-2020c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
2022-05-19HouseConference Committee Report # 2022-2020c Filed 05/16/2022; House Amendment + New Amendment
2022-05-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. W. MacDonald, Bergeron, Qualey 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
2022-05-12HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
2022-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2022, 11:30 a.m., Room 100, State House
2022-05-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Gray, Birdsell, Soucy; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
2022-05-12SenateSen. Gray Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
2022-05-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 177-139 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
2022-04-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2022-04-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar)
2022-04-22HouseDivision Work Session: 04/26/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2022-04-22HouseExecutive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2022-04-21HouseReferred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
2022-04-21HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1408h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
2022-04-21HouseAmendment # 1408h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
2022-04-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 202201408h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7
2022-04-04HouseExecutive Session: 04/13/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2022-03-30HousePublic Hearing: 04/06/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2022-03-23HouseIntroduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Election Law
2022-02-24SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4
2022-02-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8A
2022-02-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-0563s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3
2022-02-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2022-0563s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022;
2022-02-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0563s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7
2021-12-21SenateHearing: 01/12/2022, Room 103, State House, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 50
2021-12-17SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback