NH SB365 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 184-146 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 184-146 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to absentee ballot outer envelopes.
Title
Relative to absentee ballot outer envelopes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 184-146 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 14 |
2022-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/13/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Election Law |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1097s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1097s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1097s, 03/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |