NH SB364 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0276; Effective 08/23/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0276; Effective 08/23/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of electronic poll books.
Title
Relative to the use of electronic poll books.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2022; Chapter 0276; Effective 08/23/2022 |
2022-06-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2101e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2101-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/08/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Election Law |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |