NH SB363 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0111; Effective 05/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0111; Effective 05/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting political expenditures by foreign nationals.
Title
Prohibiting political expenditures by foreign nationals.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0111; Effective 05/25/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 4 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-04-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/11/2018 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0480s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0480s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0480s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |