NH SB361 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that bail commissioners be reimbursed for mileage traveled in the performance of their duties.
Title
Requiring that bail commissioners be reimbursed for mileage traveled in the performance of their duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/08/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/08/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:40 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |